Accounts and annual returns REACH4HUMANITY LTD

Charity number: 1172683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2023 20 May 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2022 19 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2021 18 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2019 Not Required