Financial history REACH4HUMANITY LTD

Charity number: 1172683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/04/2019 28/04/2020 28/04/2021 28/04/2022 28/04/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A