Accounts and annual returns 1NCLU5IVE SANDBACH
Charity number: 1171679

Charity reporting is overdue by 859 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 129 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2023 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 494 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2023 | 734 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 859 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 08 April 2020 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 08 April 2020 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 19 January 2020 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 19 January 2020 | 353 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window