Accounts and annual returns NAILBOURNE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1172381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required