Financial history NAILBOURNE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1172381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.77k £2.35k £6.29k £6.12k £0
Total expenditure £540 £2.50k £13.81k £3.54k £513
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A