LUCY’S UK DONKEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1174959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download