THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHAGFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church and the maintenance of a Grade 1 listen building and associated churchyard for the benefit of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 27 March 2017: Standard registration
- CHAGFORD PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt. Revd. NICHOLAS HOWARD PAUL MCKINNELL | Chair | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jenny Melissa Mansell O'Brien | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY ARTHUR MILTON | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Melanie Anne Holyoak | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr COLIN GREENHILL BARNES BSC FRCP | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN ARTHUR WOOD | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET FLORENCE JEFFREYS | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ANN LESLEY HAIGH | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
LUCY HELEN SHIELDS | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ROSEMARY JEAN BLEAKMAN | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
TERENCE CHARLES BLEAKMAN | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.31k | £126.31k | £120.46k | £151.79k | £162.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.08k | £135.08k | £115.18k | £144.42k | £152.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHAGFORD PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
PARISH CHURCH
CHAGFORD
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 8BN
- Phone:
- 01647432265
- Email:
- office@chagfordchurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window