Accounts and annual returns NEW LIFE CHURCH, BIGGIN HILL

Charity number: 1172916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window