MANCHESTER AND WARRINGTON AREA QUAKER MEETING (RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS)

Charity number: 1172087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time Download