Financial history MANCHESTER AND WARRINGTON AREA QUAKER MEETING (RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS)

Charity number: 1172087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £8.42m £997.45k £879.78k £375.11k £563.39k
Total expenditure £831.77k £846.37k £824.48k £612.86k £594.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.60k £5.34k £3.35k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.68m £76.69k £74.58k N/A £178.68k
Income - Other trading activities £733.86k £902.08k £789.11k N/A £310.25k
Income - Charitable activities £3.48k £7.94k £3.35k N/A £19.68k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £10.55k £10.76k £12.73k N/A £54.79k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £1.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £174.16k £174.51k £156.04k N/A £173.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds £657.60k £671.86k £668.43k N/A £420.83k
Expenditure - Governance £9.63k £5.98k £4.46k N/A £8.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution £46.59k £58.65k £48.30k N/A £40.35k
Expenditure - Investment management £3.00k £4.39k £4.90k N/A £6.08k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0