Trustees MANCHESTER AND WARRINGTON AREA QUAKER MEETING (RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS)
Charity number: 1172087

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Jane Solway | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Rosina Clark | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Louise Camacho | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey John Dean | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Turnock | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Redmond | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Calvert | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Gerard Joseph Edwards | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Ruth Haworth | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Claire Tucker OBE | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.