Accounts and annual returns T.D SEMINARY LTD

Charity number: 1172027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 30 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 26 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window