Financial history GUILD OF ST MARY AND ST ANNE SPECIAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 509374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £690.85k £47.05k £100.52k £32.91k £23.42k
Total expenditure £820.60k £121.42k £62.30k £57.40k £48.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £682.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £5.72k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £565 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £2.08k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £763.86k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.74k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £775 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £670.29k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A