SAMARITANS CHELTENHAM AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1170900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 13 JAN 2003 AS AMENDED ON 22 JAN 2004 AS AMENDED ON 25 JAN 2007 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN CHELTENHAM AND DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
CHELTENHAM AND DISTRICT.
Registration history
  • 21 February 1966 : Standard registration