CRIBS INTERNATIONAL LTD

Charity number: 1173021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN FREDERICK CAIRNS Trustee 21 February 2018 None on record
Sally Elizabeth Hyman Trustee 11 February 2018 None on record
Eleanor Shember-Critchley Trustee 24 February 2020 None on record
Natalie Jane Luzmore Trustee 28 February 2021 None on record
CHRISTINE LEE Trustee 24 September 2019 None on record
Mx Antonia Petra Davis Trustee 15 July 2020 None on record
NEIL WILLIAM MAYBIN Trustee 26 November 2017
HIGHWAY ONE TRUST Received: On time
Jennifer Easton Trustee 18 May 2020 None on record