Accounts and annual returns THE CHORLTON CONVENT BURSARIES TRUST
Charity number: 509408

Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 460 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 460 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 825 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 825 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 01 July 2019 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window