Financial history THE CHORLTON CONVENT BURSARIES TRUST

Charity number: 509408
Charity reporting is overdue by 817 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £13.35k £12.95k £6.99k £6.81k £7.07k
Total expenditure £1.62k £2.11k £7.09k £34.26k £7.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A