BLANDFORD YOUTH CENTRE MANAGEMENT BOARD

Charity number: 1171690
Charity reporting is up to date (101 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2020 11 July 2021 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 11 July 2021 101 days late Download
Annual return 01 June 2019 27 October 2020 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2019 27 October 2020 209 days late Download
Annual return 01 June 2018 12 July 2019 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2018 12 July 2019 102 days late Download