Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE HOLME

Charity number: 1171716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 August 2020 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required