Financial history FRIENDS OF THE HOLME

Charity number: 1171716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £10.71k £5.51k £7.82k £4.67k £5.17k
Total expenditure £8.81k £3.07k £14.85k £1.92k £8.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A