Trustees LANCASTER UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1172269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cerys Evans Chair 01 July 2023
None on record
Ariana Dell Trustee 12 January 2024
None on record
Laura Yianni Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Santiago Siabato Trujillo Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Joshua Connor Newsham Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Thomas Cross Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Samuel Alexander Hedges Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Jack William Watson Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Nathan Mooney Trustee 10 March 2023
None on record
Harrison Stewart Trustee 03 October 2022
MORECAMBE BAY PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Michael Charles Leckie Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Richard Michael Soper Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
David Philip Morris Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
Amanda Chetwynd Trustee 07 September 2019
MIRADOR
Received: On time