Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S, PERRY BARR, 236TH BIRMINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 509434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 August 2020 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required