Accounts and annual returns A.C.U.T.E

Charity number: 1173613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 January 2020 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 January 2020 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 December 2018 49 days late Download Open in new window