Trustees SELSEY PAVILION TRUST

Charity number: 1171518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christian Skelton Chair 23 August 2019
None on record
Mary Louise Goldsmith Trustee 07 November 2021
None on record
Rosemary Frances Neal Trustee 06 September 2020
None on record
Philip Donald Bassett Trustee 06 September 2020
None on record
Keith Henry Batchelor Trustee 29 September 2019
None on record
Gillian Anne Plowman Trustee 23 August 2019
ARTS DREAM SELSEY
Overdue by 87 days
GILLIAN MARGARET Walsh Trustee 03 January 2017
SELSEY COMMUNITY FORUM
Recently registered
PAMELA ROSALIND HOWARD OBE Trustee 03 January 2017
None on record