COMMUNITY MINIBUS ASSOCIATION (WEST SUSSEX)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local community transport service run wholly by unpaid volunteers, - for the public benefit, the relief and assistance to people in need in West Sussex, who may be isolated, in need of community support and who require access to essential needs. - for promotion of social inclusion, community cohesion, integration and voluntary service for all age groups regardless of ability and wealth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £13,438 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
268 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 13 July 2017: CIO registration
- 14 June 2018: Funds received from 275787 COMMUNITY MINIBUS ASSOCIATION (WEST SUSSEX)
- WEST SUSSEX MINIBUS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Hughes | Trustee | 22 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kay Gibbon | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gerry Toner | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR A W DOLBY | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.74k | £35.09k | £39.25k | £70.36k | £82.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.50k | £57.55k | £57.46k | £60.40k | £56.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £13.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FACILITIES IN WEST SUSSEX FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE ELDERLY, YOUNG, POOR OR LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO ADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old School Car Park
School Lane
Storrington
Pulborough
West Sussex
RH20 4LL
- Phone:
- 01903740282
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window