Accounts and annual returns THE HARBOUR PROJECT FOR SWINDON REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity number: 1171368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window