Trustees THE HARBOUR PROJECT FOR SWINDON REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity number: 1171368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID MICHAEL ROWLANDS Chair 01 April 2017
None on record
Emma Graham Trustee 27 May 2022
None on record
Mari Williams Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Housam Al-Housami Trustee 10 February 2022
None on record
NEDA KRISHNAN Trustee 26 March 2021
None on record
Faisal Nawaf Mayed Trustee 31 May 2019
None on record
IAN WEIR ROBERTSON Trustee 01 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CIRENCESTER WITH WATERMOOR AND ST.LAWRENCE
Received: On time
HADIZA MAHUTA Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record