Financial history 2:52 CHALLENGE

Charity number: 1173219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £28.59k £25.68k £19.59k £12.50k £14.01k
Total expenditure £22.12k £23.88k £18.59k £11.41k £15.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A