Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAELS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1171326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 07 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 07 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 04 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 04 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 25 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 05 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 05 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window