Trustees ST MICHAELS VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1171326

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH W J MULHOLLAND | Chair | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Elizabeth Mulholland | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
JIM SELFRIDGE | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
IVOR RUSHFORTH | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Victor Colin Cole | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
ANGELA CAMIER | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
JEAN CURTEIS | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||
CATHERINE HEDGES | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
BRIGITTE WATKINS | Trustee | 30 September 2001 |
|
|
||||||||
TRACEY POOLEMAN | Trustee | 30 September 2001 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.