OUSEBURN LEARNING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust holds land and buildings which it makes available to several schools in Newcastle upon Tyne. It also acts as a forum for those schools with higher education institutions and employers in the city to coordinate educational programmes and improve outcomes. The Trust works to embed the schools in the local community and strengthen links between the trust, schools, careers and community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 30 March 2017: Standard registration
- OLT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AILSA ELIZABETH NOKES | Chair | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clive Maddison | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Edminson | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Peter van Zwanenberg | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin McVittee | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matt Ward | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Goldwater | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fergus Westwood | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Martin | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Jon Bryan | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Miss Rebecca Jackson | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN WASSALL | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA FURNO | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
FATHER ALLAN WILLI MARKS | Trustee | 05 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH MARY TYLER | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.44k | £21.23k | £4.67k | £11.52k | £12.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.86m | £277.78k | £227.99k | £210.78k | £211.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ADVANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, EDUCATION, HEALTH AND TRAINING FOR ALL THE CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES OF ENGLAND AND WALES INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ANY SCHOOL WHICH IS A QUALIFYING SCHOOL OR AT ANY OTHER SCHOOL IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE COMPANY ACTS OR HAS ACTED AS A FOUNDATION, IT BEING ACKNOWLEDGED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THE OBJECTS THE COMPANY MUST, SO FAR AS IS CONSISTENT WITH THIS PURPOSE, HAVE REGARD TO ITS OBLIGATION TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY COHESION UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST JESMOND PRIMARY SCHOOL
TANKERVILLE TERRACE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 3AJ
- Phone:
- 01912659599
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window