Accounts and annual returns FASHION REVOLUTION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173421
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 02 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 02 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 26 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 26 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 08 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 02 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 16 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 16 September 2019 On time