Accounts and annual returns DULWICH PREP CRANBROOK

Charity number: 1174358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 11 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window