Trustees DULWICH PREP CRANBROOK

Charity number: 1174358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER ANDERSON II Chair 12 June 2017
None on record
Tom Durie Trustee 24 March 2022
ST PETER'S COLLEGE, RADLEY
Received: On time
Brian Eric Charles Lynch Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Sonja Jenkins Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Steve Miller Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Nikki Sarah Payne Trustee 26 March 2018
None on record
MRS SUE MORGAN Trustee 16 June 2017
None on record
MRS KATE NASH Trustee 12 June 2017
HASTINGS AND ROTHER MEDIATION SERVICE
Recently registered
Michael StJohn ASHLEY Trustee 12 June 2017
DULWICH PREPARATORY SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
Susanna Lesley Rynehart Trustee 12 June 2017
None on record