LIVERPOOL ROOTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 509514
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £111.40k £82.36k £77.62k £76.60k £75.22k
Total expenditure £80.28k £81.17k £76.32k £76.34k £78.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £68.94k £68.94k £68.94k £68.94k £68.94k