PHOENIX FRENCH BULLDOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1171943
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download