Trustees CHARLIES-ANGEL-CENTRE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1172233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ruth curtis Chair 13 May 2013
None on record
Rachel Cheshire Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
Allan Todd Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
shane curtis Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Bradley Curtis Trustee 06 September 2017
None on record
Yvonne Ugarte Trustee 14 May 2016
None on record
clive key Trustee 13 May 2013
None on record
SAM KEY Trustee 13 May 2013
None on record
carrie curtis Trustee 13 May 2013
None on record
G CURTIS Trustee 13 May 2013
None on record