CAMBRIDGE REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT CAMPAIGN

Charity number: 1172836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 May 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 May 2020 30 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 July 2019 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 July 2019 83 days late Download