CAMBRIDGE REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT CAMPAIGN

Charity number: 1172836
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Elizabeth Briggs Trustee 09 January 2019
EDLUMINO EDUCATION AID Charity reporting is up to date
Dr HEIDI RADKE Trustee 02 May 2017 None on record
SUSAN MARGARET SPENCER Trustee 02 May 2017
KADAM ASIAN DANCE AND MUSIC LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
ROBERT TURNER Trustee 02 May 2017 None on record
DANIEL RASTOM ELLIS BSC. MSC. Trustee 02 May 2017 None on record
Dr Joanna Burch Trustee 13 February 2019
CAMBRIDGE SPORT LAKES TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
EDLUMINO EDUCATION AID Charity reporting is up to date
Ann Goodridge Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
Adrian Matthews Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Catharine Lucy Walston Trustee 13 February 2019
CAMBRIDGE CONVOY REFUGEE ACTION GROUP Charity reporting is up to date