Accounts and annual returns THE GISSING TRUST

Charity number: 509607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 01 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 01 July 2021 304 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 17 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required