THE GOLDSMITHS' CRAFT AND DESIGN COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to promote the artistry and historic practices of goldsmithing, silversmithing, jewellery and allied crafts. A major activity is an annual competition awarding prizes in recognition of excellence in both design and making of jewellery and valuable objects. Also the participation in exhibitions and other activities to educate the general public about the crafts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
108 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Ruth Bishop | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Lockwood | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maeve Gillies | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Ball | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Stephen Kyte | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARIE REEVES | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER CLEMENT CRUMP | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN PUTLAND | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.95k | £127.64k | £172.08k | £181.49k | £211.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.38k | £131.69k | £147.14k | £176.86k | £178.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE THE ARTISTRY AND HISTORIC PRACTICES OF GOLDSMITHING, SILVERSMITHING, JEWELLERY AND THE ALLIED CRAFTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOLDSMITHS' HALL
13 FOSTER LANE
LONDON
EC2V 6BN
- Phone:
- 02076067010
- Email:
- theclerk@thegoldsmiths.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window