SK COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1173296
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 04 June 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 04 June 2021 65 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 11 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 11 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 15 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 15 March 2019 On time Download