LYMM RFC LIMITED

Charity number: 1172259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN CARTWRIGHT Trustee 21 December 2016 None on record
DAVID SIMPSON Trustee 04 January 2017 None on record
Malcolm Pritchard Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record
ANDREW LEACH Trustee 11 September 2016 None on record
Anthony Wright Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record
Richard John Colin Johnson Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record