MILLING 4 LIFE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To globally promote the development of food and feed milling processes and storage and agriculture to the ultimate benefit of the conditions of life for socially and economically disadvantaged communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Algeria
- Andorra
- Angola
- Austria
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bhutan
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- China
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Djibouti
- Egypt
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- France
- Gabon
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Japan
- Jersey
- Kenya
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Malta
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Montenegro
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Rwanda
- São Tomé And Principe
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sudan
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United States
- Vietnam
- Western Sahara
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 24 April 2017: CIO registration
- MILLING FOR LIFE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER DARRYL GILBERT | Chair | 24 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Simon Birks | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Ray Jackson | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|||||
PENGESTUTI TAN-GILBERT | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Sven-Olof Malmqvist | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £858 | £0 | £112 | £112 | £18 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £10 | £0 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF FOOD AND FEED MILLING PROCESSES AND STORAGE AND AGRICULTURE. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS ‘DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS’.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sherbornes Solicitors Co
4 Royal Crescent
CHELTENHAM
GL50 3DA
- Phone:
- 01242250030
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window