SOUTHDENE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support community and voluntary group activities benefitting the community of Southdene, Kirkby
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Knowsley
Governance
- 15 January 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS JACKIE HARRIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MRS CAROL RYAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIE ELLEN STUART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.60k | £2.79k | £11.47k | £8.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.30k | £513 | £2.45k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1980 AND AMENDED 17TH JUNE 2003.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CENTRAL AND CHERRYFIELD ELECTORAL WARDS WHICH COMPRISES THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF SOUTHDENE AND DISTRICT OF KIRKBY IN THE BOROUGH OF KNOWSLEY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
CENTRAL AND CHERRYFIELD ELECTORAL WARDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 BEWLEY DRIVE
LIVERPOOL
L32 7PT
- Phone:
- 01515459019
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window