THE ROYAL PARKS [LIMITED]

Charity number: 1172042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We look after eight of London's largest open spaces; Hyde, The Green, Richmond, Greenwich, St James's, Bushy and The Regent's Parks, and Kensington Gardens. We also manage other important open spaces in the capital including Grosvenor Square Garden, Brompton Cemetery, Victoria Tower Gardens, Canning Green and Poet's Corner.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden
  • City Of Westminster
  • Greenwich
  • Hillingdon
  • Hounslow
  • Kensington And Chelsea
  • Richmond Upon Thames

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 March 2017: Standard registration
  • 15 May 2018: Funds received from 1097545 ROYAL PARKS FOUNDATION
  • 01 February 2022: Funds received from 1027134 RICHMOND PARK CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Loyd Daniel Gilman Grossman Trustee 01 September 2024
THE CAMPDEN SOCIETY
Received: On time
Adam Hug Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Councillor Anthony Okereke Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Harris Bokhari Trustee 02 July 2022
None on record
Gareth Roberts Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Countess of Antrim Aurora Dale McDonnell Trustee 14 August 2021
None on record
Jane Ellen Hurst Trustee 14 August 2021
None on record
BRONWYN HILL CBE Trustee 15 December 2020
None on record
Wesley Albert Kerr Trustee 14 November 2020
THE ROYAL HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
HEATHER FRANCES BLACKMAN Trustee 14 November 2020
THE HOWLETTS WILD ANIMAL TRUST
Received: On time
Lt Col Michael Vernon Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Richard Hamilton Trustee 02 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £73.16m £48.31m £87.72m £104.64m £123.02m
Total expenditure £68.61m £52.40m £76.84m £95.77m £113.11m
Income from government contracts £35.97m £25.01m £42.37m £49.51m £56.86m
Income from government grants N/A £1.18m £2.26m N/A £1.50m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.96m £2.43m £4.57m £2.28m £6.67m
Income - Other trading activities £29.30m £19.58m £34.62m £43.82m £48.71m
Income - Charitable activities £5.13m £924.00k £5.16m £8.16m £8.77m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £230.00k £11.00k £536.00k £555.00k £1.06m
Income - Other £36.53m £25.36m £42.84m £49.82m £57.81m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £58.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £39.39m £33.08m £41.28m £52.78m £61.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £355.00k £436.00k £486.00k £4.03m £5.44m
Expenditure - Governance £123.00k £159.00k £126.00k £120.00k £318.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £6.00k £131.00k £219.00k £299.00k
Expenditure - Other £28.86m £18.89m £35.08m £38.96m £46.10m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £93.38m £89.38m £86.44m £96.07m £94.96m
Long-term investments £0 £27.97m £31.10m £43.68m £48.95m
Other assets £59.54m £26.75m £57.51m £47.59m £52.25m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £22.21m £17.52m £37.91m £33.63m £32.37m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE OLD POLICE HOUSE
HYDE PARK
LONDON
W2 2UH
Phone:
03000612000