SOUTH WEST GSD RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was set up to relieve the suffering and distress of unwanted, stray or ill treated German Shepherd dogs primarily but not exclusively.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger John Evans | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Burgess | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
paula evans | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.81k | £69.83k | £74.80k | £34.98k | £37.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.97k | £91.12k | £66.10k | £31.90k | £36.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 July 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTIVES ARE TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF UNWANTED, STRAY OR ILL TREATED GERMAN SHEPHERD DOGS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE SOUTH WEST WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO OLDER DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paddon Park
Shebbear
BEAWORTHY
Devon
EX21 5RD
- Phone:
- 01409281636
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window