Trustees SHOTS IN THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1172414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Casey Chair 01 January 2019
None on record
Russ Howell Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
Terry Owens Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Sue Carter Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Paul Marcus Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
SHAHID AZEEM Trustee 01 April 2017
HIGH SHERIFF OF SURREY YOUTH AWARDS
Received: On time
RUSHMOOR MUSLIM ASSOCIATION
Recently registered