SMILE EBENEZER - HOUSES OF JOY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the charity organises recreative activities for the vulnerable families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 January 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 28 February 2017: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FILOMENA BAMBA | Chair | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER KAMANGEKO MASONGA | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULO DANIEL ERNESTO | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/01/2018 | 25/01/2019 | 25/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.67k | £6.08k | £5.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.08k | £6.84k | £5.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 165 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 165 days | |
Annual return | 25 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 531 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 531 days | |
Annual return | 25 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 896 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 896 days | |
Annual return | 25 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1261 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1261 days | |
Annual return | 25 January 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE 1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY TO THOSE PEOPLE LIVING THROUGHOUT LONDON AND THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS, SERVICES AND ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 TITLEY CLOSE
LONDON
E4 8PL
- Phone:
- 07438542291
- Email:
- smileebenezer@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window