AMT FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and the relief of those in need by reason of age, ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage by providing grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- India
- Malawi
- Morocco
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- South Africa
- Syria
- Turkey
Governance
- 15 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASJAD MUHAMMAD HUSSAIN | Chair | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
SAFINA KAUSER | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
RUKHSANA ASLAM | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2019 | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.61k | £62.95k | £73.45k | £123.00k | £140.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.36k | £25.97k | £39.53k | £85.78k | £117.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 AUG 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES)AS THE MEMBERS SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING GRANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o AMT Lawyers
26 Wellington Street St Johns
Blackburn
BB1 8AF
- Phone:
- 01254698317
- Email:
- info@amtfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window